U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Hodgens
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Supervision]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2021
  • January 14, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • January 13, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • January 13, 2021: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • January 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • January 08, 2021: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • January 08, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
October, 2020
  • October 02, 2020: [Order]
  • October 02, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • September 29, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 29, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 29, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 28, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • September 21, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • July 24, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
May, 2020
  • May 19, 2020: [Order]
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 15, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
March, 2020
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.