U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:92-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Smith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2020
  • December 16, 2020: [Letter]
  • December 16, 2020: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
August, 2020
  • August 24, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • August 13, 2020: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2020: [Release from Custody]
  • August 05, 2020: [Appoint Counsel]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 21, 2020: [Return Receipt]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2020: [Release from Custody]
February, 2020
  • February 03, 2020: [Reduce Sentence - USSC Amendment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • February 03, 2020: [Add Counts - Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.