U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-00011-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Dickerson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 21, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Supervision]
January, 2021
  • January 25, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 24, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 24, 2020: [Judgment]
  • September 24, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 14, 2020: [Witness List]
  • September 14, 2020: [Sentencing]
June, 2020
  • June 09, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 09, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • June 09, 2020: [Order]
  • June 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 08, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • June 02, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 02, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 20, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 25, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 23, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 03, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 12, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • February 10, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • February 05, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 05, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • February 04, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 04, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 03, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 03, 2020: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • February 03, 2020: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.