U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:12-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cann
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Modification or Reduction of Sentence]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 07, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 29, 2021: [Amended Judgment]
  • December 10, 2021: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Exhibit List]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 20, 2021: [Preliminary Hearing On Petition For Warrant Or Summons For Offender Under Supervison]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 14, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • October 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
August, 2020
  • August 03, 2020: [Letter]
February, 2020
  • February 04, 2020: [Clerk's Order Reassigning Case]
  • February 04, 2020: [3582 - Motion For Modification Or Reduction Of Sentence]
  • February 04, 2020: [Letter]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.