U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Evans
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Supervision]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 17, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 01, 2021: [Letter]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Letter]
January, 2021
  • January 21, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • January 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 08, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • December 09, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 03, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 03, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2020: [Sentencing]
  • December 02, 2020: [Witness List]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File Document]
  • November 23, 2020: [Leave To File Document]
  • November 19, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [Order]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 13, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2020
  • September 28, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2020
  • July 28, 2020: [Pretrial]
  • July 16, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 16, 2020: [Proposed Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order]
  • July 13, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2020: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 10, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 08, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 06, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [In Limine]
  • June 29, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File Document]
  • June 26, 2020: [Leave To File Document]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 26, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 26, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • May 26, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • May 13, 2020: [Order]
March, 2020
  • March 05, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 02, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Order]
  • February 27, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 26, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • February 20, 2020: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • February 20, 2020: [Bond]
  • February 20, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 20, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 20, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 18, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • February 14, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 11, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 05, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order]
  • February 05, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2020: [Add Counts]
  • February 04, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • February 04, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.