U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:19-cr-00301-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • November 16, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Response To Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [Leave To File Document]
  • September 27, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 14, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order]
  • March 31, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 30, 2021: [Order]
  • March 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
February, 2021
  • February 12, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
December, 2020
  • December 17, 2020: [Order]
  • December 17, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2020
  • September 16, 2020: [Order]
  • September 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 04, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Order]
  • June 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2020: [Order]
  • June 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2020
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 16, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order]
  • February 10, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 10, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • February 10, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 10, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2020: [Order]
  • February 07, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 04, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.