U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00024-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bess
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Motions Referred]
  • August 18, 2022: [Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 17, 2022: [Memorandum In Support]
  • August 17, 2022: [2255 - Motion To Vacate, Set Aside Or Correct Sentence]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • November 19, 2021: [Opinion]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
  • October 15, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 11, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • April 23, 2021: [Transcript - Sealed]
  • April 21, 2021: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Re: Miscellaneous]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • March 08, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • March 08, 2021: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • February 26, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2021: [Witness List]
  • February 09, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2021: [Order]
  • February 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2021
  • January 13, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2020
  • November 23, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 23, 2020: [Continue]
October, 2020
  • October 19, 2020: [Order]
  • October 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 26, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • August 24, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 24, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 14, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
July, 2020
  • July 17, 2020: [Order]
  • July 17, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 22, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • June 22, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 20, 2020: [Continue]
  • June 04, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2020
  • May 18, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 14, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 28, 2020: [Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 22, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 10, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 02, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 19, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 19, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 10, 2020: [Order]
  • March 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
February, 2020
  • February 05, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • February 05, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • February 04, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • February 04, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • February 04, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.