U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joseph
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Property/PreTrial]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Receipt for Passport]
April, 2021
  • April 13, 2021: [Return of Property/PreTrial]
December, 2020
  • December 30, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 07, 2020: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2020: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • December 07, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 01, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
July, 2020
  • July 29, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 29, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 27, 2020: [Continue]
  • July 27, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2020
  • June 08, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • June 08, 2020: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 08, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 08, 2020: [Witness List]
  • June 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • April 23, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • April 01, 2020: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • March 19, 2020: [PS 8 Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • March 19, 2020: [Order on Petition]
  • March 19, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 05, 2020: [Paperless Order]
  • March 05, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 02, 2020: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2020: [Witness List]
  • March 02, 2020: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 02, 2020: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
February, 2020
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Special Appearance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 25, 2020: [Court Fee Paid]
  • February 25, 2020: [Special Appearance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Appear]
  • February 07, 2020: [Subpoena Returned Executed]
  • February 07, 2020: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 06, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 06, 2020: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.