open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00034
    Party Name:Linton v. Warden
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:March 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [File Excess Pages]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:March 02, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48263
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 2 =