open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-bk-00161
    Party Name:Dana J Rodriguez
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Telephonic Ch 13 341]
    Date Published:March 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Meeting of Creditors Continued]
    Date Published:March 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Notice of Continuance of Meeting of Creditors (Paper)]
    Date Published:March 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Proposed Order]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Continue Hearing]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [BNC ADI Returned Mail]
    Date Published:March 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched - BK]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Allow Direct Plan Payments]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Chapter 13 Plan]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Schedules A-J]
    Date Published:February 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [BNC Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:February 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Notice of Missing Documents]
    Date Published:February 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Auto Assignment Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [none]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [none]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Payment Advices]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Morris, Helen M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?76448
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =