U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:03-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Adkins et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2020
  • October 26, 2020: [Supervision]
June, 2020
  • June 25, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 25, 2020: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 23, 2020: [Revocation Of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 22, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Order]
  • April 30, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2020
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 25, 2020: [Order]
  • March 25, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 24, 2020: [Order]
  • February 24, 2020: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • February 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.