U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00035-2
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Banks et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary or Initial]
  • October 10, 2024: [Waiver Of Preliminary Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 07, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
March, 2021
  • March 16, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 03, 2020: [Notice of Dismissal / Order of Dismissal]
  • December 01, 2020: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 19, 2020: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 19, 2020: [Judgment]
  • November 19, 2020: [Sentencing]
October, 2020
  • October 21, 2020: [Objection To Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 14, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [Order]
  • October 13, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2020
  • September 25, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 22, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • September 04, 2020: [Objection To Presentence Report - SEALED - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
August, 2020
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition To Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and R]
  • August 26, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 26, 2020: [Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and Recommendations]
  • August 26, 2020: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
  • August 18, 2020: [Order]
  • August 12, 2020: [Order]
  • August 04, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
July, 2020
  • July 27, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • July 16, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 16, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 16, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • July 16, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 15, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 15, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 14, 2020: [Order]
  • July 14, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 13, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • July 10, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • July 02, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 02, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • July 02, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order]
  • July 01, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2020
  • June 30, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • June 25, 2020: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 24, 2020: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • June 24, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • June 23, 2020: [Order]
  • June 23, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 17, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • June 16, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 16, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 16, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 09, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 03, 2020: [Order]
May, 2020
  • May 29, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 29, 2020: [Order]
  • May 29, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 21, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
April, 2020
  • April 27, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 24, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 09, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2020: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
March, 2020
  • March 31, 2020: [Order]
  • March 30, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 27, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • March 26, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • March 26, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 26, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • March 25, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2020: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • March 12, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Bond]
  • March 12, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • March 12, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • March 11, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 09, 2020: [Order]
  • March 09, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 06, 2020: [Bond]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 02, 2020: [Order]
  • March 02, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
February, 2020
  • February 28, 2020: [Order]
  • February 28, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 28, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • February 28, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 28, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 27, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 27, 2020: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • February 27, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • February 27, 2020: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • February 27, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 27, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • February 26, 2020: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 25, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Detention Hearing]
  • February 25, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 25, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.