U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Pratt
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Mandate]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice Of Judgment]
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment Entered By 4CCA]
  • February 14, 2022: [Opinion]
May, 2021
  • May 07, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment With Forms Attached]
  • March 26, 2021: [Transcript]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Of 4CCA Appointing FPD]
  • March 15, 2021: [Notice Of Appellate Case Opening From 4CCA]
  • March 12, 2021: [Transmittal Of Notice Of Appeal To 4CCA]
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice Of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 05, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • March 01, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • March 01, 2021: [Judgment]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Expedite]
  • February 19, 2021: [Order]
  • February 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 19, 2021: [Expedite]
January, 2021
  • January 15, 2021: [Order]
  • January 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2020
  • November 09, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2020
  • October 22, 2020: [Order]
  • October 22, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 08, 2020: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 13, 2020: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 13, 2020: [Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2020: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 09, 2020: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 07, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2020: [Order]
  • July 06, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2020: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • July 06, 2020: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • July 06, 2020: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 02, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 02, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 01, 2020: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 01, 2020: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 19, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 17, 2020: [Response To Motion]
  • June 15, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 05, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 28, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 07, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • May 07, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 01, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 30, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2020: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 14, 2020: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 10, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 10, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
March, 2020
  • March 23, 2020: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 20, 2020: [Order]
  • March 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 18, 2020: [Waiver Of Right To Be Present At Hearings On Motions Prior To Trial]
  • March 18, 2020: [Waiver Of Interstate Agreement On Detainers]
  • March 18, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 18, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • March 06, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 06, 2020: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 05, 2020: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 04, 2020: [Writ Of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order]
  • March 04, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2020: [Order for Warrant]
  • March 04, 2020: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • March 03, 2020: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.