open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-bk-30201
    Party Name:Connie Lynn Gibson
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:May 30, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Notice of Missing Documents (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Uploaded Creditors]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Add Trustee]
    Date Published:May 23, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Tax Documents]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto Docket of Credit Card]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Statement of Social Security Number(s)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Calculation (Form 22A)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling Course]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Holbrook, Janet Smith [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?122959
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =