open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:5:20-cv-00101
    Party Name:Smith v. Jay-Bee Oil & Gas, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [State Court Papers]
    Date Published:June 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:June 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appear]
    Date Published:June 01, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Stay]
    Date Published:May 29, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stay]
    Date Published:May 28, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Paperless Order]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util-Set Motion, Evidentiary, R&R and SS Oral Argument Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:May 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [First Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order]
    Date Published:May 26, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:May 22, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?48910
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =