open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:2:20-cr-00127-1
    Party Name:United States of America v. Dempsey
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Presentence Report]
    Date Published:August 17, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice Of Docket Correction]
    Date Published:August 16, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Written Plea Of Guilty]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Waiver Of Indictment]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 12, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:August 10, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
    Date Published:August 05, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Information - Felony]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvsd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?229900
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 3 =