open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

WEST VIRGINIA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia
    Case Number:3:20-cv-00138
    Party Name:Johnson v. Dankwa et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance]
    Date Published:September 18, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order (PUBLIC)]
    Date Published:August 27, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Court-Approved Form]
    Date Published:August 25, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Return Receipt]
    Date Published:August 13, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Filing Fee Received]
    Date Published:August 06, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint (NOT for attorney use)]
    Date Published:August 04, 2020
  • Source: https://ecf.wvnd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?49393
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =