U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 22, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 21, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 21, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Paperless Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 17, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 17, 2022: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 17, 2022: [Paperless Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Case Unsealed]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 09, 2021: [Unseal Case]
February, 2021
  • February 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.