U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BAILEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • September 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 11, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • May 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 10, 2021: [Detain]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 14, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • April 14, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [Other Document]
  • March 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
February, 2021
  • February 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 26, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 26, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • February 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • February 26, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • February 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.