U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Canseco-Ventura
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 13, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • May 12, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • May 12, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • May 12, 2021: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 12, 2021: [Plea And Sentence]
  • May 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Order]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 16, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 06, 2021: [Order]
  • April 06, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • March 18, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • March 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 01, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.