U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hansen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Petition]
  • April 29, 2025: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
  • April 11, 2025: [Court Fee Paid]
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Court Fee Paid]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Oral Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • January 12, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 10, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 09, 2023: [Appear]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 05, 2023: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Hearing]
  • January 05, 2023: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Paperless Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 03, 2023: [Court Fee Paid]
  • January 03, 2023: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2022: [PROB 12C Petition for Warrant or Summons - Supervised Offender]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • December 12, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • October 26, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Public Motion]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Envelope Received]
  • October 05, 2022: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Petition]
  • September 14, 2022: [PROB 12A Non-Compliance Summary]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Court Fee Paid]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • December 02, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • August 04, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • May 06, 2021: [Letter]
March, 2021
  • March 01, 2021: [Transfer In - Probationer or Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.