U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Walker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Supervision]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 07, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • September 22, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order]
  • September 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 23, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 23, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 13, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 12, 2021: [Transcript]
March, 2021
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 08, 2021: [Transcript Request]
  • March 05, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 02, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • March 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 02, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 02, 2021: [Bond]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 02, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 02, 2021: [Order]
  • March 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 01, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • March 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.