U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00171-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Coleman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Notice Of Transfer To Another Jurisdiction]
  • September 12, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 12, 2022: [Letter]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • April 22, 2022: [Letter]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 19, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • October 18, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Release from Custody]
  • September 14, 2021: [Release From Custody]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 13, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 12, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 14, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 13, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • April 29, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • April 15, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 09, 2021: [Order]
  • April 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
  • March 09, 2021: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
  • March 02, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.