U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00022-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Craig
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Document]
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • July 15, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Transcript Purchase Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • May 24, 2022: [USCA Notice of Appellate Case Opening]
  • May 23, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 13, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • April 20, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 19, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 19, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Other Document]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Witness List]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 11, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 07, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order to Seal Document]
  • October 06, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • October 05, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Transcript Purchase Order - NON-APPELLATE]
  • October 04, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 01, 2021: [Pretrial Conference]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 17, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 17, 2021: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Witness List]
  • September 17, 2021: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 25, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 18, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 11, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.