U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weber et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Public Motion]
  • May 06, 2025: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Letter]
  • May 01, 2025: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 19, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • October 14, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion, Evidentiary and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
  • September 12, 2022: [Return Receipt]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 18, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • August 05, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Letter]
  • May 03, 2022: [Return Receipt]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 25, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • April 07, 2022: [Objection to Report and Recommendations]
  • April 07, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • April 04, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Judges]
  • March 31, 2022: [Vacate (2255)]
  • March 25, 2022: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 21, 2022: [Return Receipt]
  • March 15, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 14, 2022: [Vacate (2255)]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • February 11, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • February 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • February 10, 2022: [Expedite]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 13, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • November 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 05, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • November 05, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 29, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 29, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • October 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Psychiatric Report]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Return Receipt]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Public Motion]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 16, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 13, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • August 13, 2021: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Adopting Report and Recommendations]
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • June 07, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • April 16, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order (SEALED)]
  • April 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 16, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • March 14, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 14, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.