U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shaw
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 30, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Other Document]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2021: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • July 14, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • July 13, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 10, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • June 09, 2021: [Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 14, 2021: [Continue]
March, 2021
  • March 30, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 11, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 11, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 08, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • March 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 08, 2021: [Detain]
  • March 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 03, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • March 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment - Unredacted (SEALED)]
  • March 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.