U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:19-cr-00181-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ravenscroft
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 20, 2023: [Modify Conditions Of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Supervision]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 26, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 26, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order]
  • July 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 20, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Presentence Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 29, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order]
  • April 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 14, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 14, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 14, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • April 08, 2021: [Order]
  • April 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 07, 2021: [Motions Referred]
  • April 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Order]
  • March 24, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 04, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 04, 2021: [Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 04, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 04, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 04, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.