U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00006-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 25, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • August 25, 2021: [Other Document]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 28, 2021: [Judgment]
  • July 26, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • July 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2021: [Witness List]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
April, 2021
  • April 15, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 25, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 15, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 15, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 15, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • March 12, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 11, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • March 10, 2021: [Leave to File Document]
  • March 08, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • March 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 04, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.