U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order Granting Notice Of Dismissal]
  • April 11, 2022: [Notice Of Dismissal by USA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • April 01, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice Regarding US Passport - Original Notice]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Pretrial]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 14, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • April 13, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • April 13, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • April 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2021
  • March 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 26, 2021: [Bond]
  • March 26, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 23, 2021: [Order]
  • March 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 22, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 05, 2021: [Order]
  • March 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 05, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 05, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • March 05, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 05, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.