U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Zeigler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Response To Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2022: [Proof Of Service By Publication]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Supervision]
  • July 08, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • July 01, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 28, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • June 21, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 01, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 01, 2022: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 01, 2022: [Presentence Report]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 24, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 07, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • July 01, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • April 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • April 05, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
March, 2021
  • March 25, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • March 16, 2021: [Order]
  • March 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 12, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • March 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • March 12, 2021: [Witness List]
  • March 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • March 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 11, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • March 09, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 09, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 09, 2021: [Order]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • March 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.