U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Cooper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 21, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 21, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 15, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2021
  • March 18, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • March 18, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • March 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 17, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • March 17, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • March 10, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 09, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.