U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00019-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Kistner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • December 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2021: [Supervision]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal Highly Sensitive Document]
  • December 06, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • December 06, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Other Payment]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Other Payment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Other Payment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • August 24, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • August 24, 2021: [Witness List]
  • August 24, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • August 17, 2021: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • August 16, 2021: [Other Payment]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • August 10, 2021: [COVID-19 Juror Questionnaire (Blank)]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 14, 2021: [Other Payment]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Other Payment]
May, 2021
  • May 12, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 03, 2021: [Other Payment]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order]
  • April 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 20, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 07, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • April 06, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.