U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gardner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 17, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 17, 2021: [Judgment]
  • August 17, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • August 09, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 18, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • May 18, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 18, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 19, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 19, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 16, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.