U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00013-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nelson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 08, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 07, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 07, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2022: [Other Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • December 08, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • November 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • August 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 18, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 10, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Mail Returned]
  • April 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • April 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 19, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 19, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • April 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.