U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Civil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Public Motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Motion (PUBLIC)]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 05, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • October 04, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 05, 2021: [Receipt for Passport]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 26, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • April 26, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • April 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • April 26, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • April 26, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 20, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • April 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 19, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.