U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00007-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion (SEALED)]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order (SEALED)]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • June 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • May 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 09, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Other Document]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • October 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • October 06, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Envelope Received]
  • September 28, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • September 16, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Article III Judge]
  • September 02, 2021: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 02, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
  • May 27, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • May 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 11, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • May 10, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • May 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • May 03, 2021: [Paperless Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
April, 2021
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.