U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Thompson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 22, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 29, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Travel]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 05, 2021: [Bond]
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 11, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 11, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Criminal Debt Payment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 01, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 22, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 21, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • April 21, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.