U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00051-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Price
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 15, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 15, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 03, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • August 24, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 04, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 02, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 14, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 11, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing Started - But Not Completed]
  • May 07, 2021: [Order]
  • May 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 23, 2021: [Add Counts]
  • April 23, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 22, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.