U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Northern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Northern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
  • October 01, 2021: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Sentencing Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
August, 2021
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Response in Support of Motion]
  • July 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 12, 2021: [Court Fee Paid]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Filing Plea Agreement]
  • June 22, 2021: [Other Document (PUBLIC)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting (NOT RESETTING) Plea Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Telephone Conference]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings (NOT Ex Parte)]
May, 2021
  • May 30, 2021: [Notice (Nextgen)]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order (PUBLIC)]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • April 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • April 23, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.