U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Van-Horn
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to Self Report]
  • December 07, 2021: [Extend Time To Self Report]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 02, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 02, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Pretrial]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 15, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 14, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • October 13, 2021: [Exhibits In Support]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 05, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 05, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 03, 2021: [Statement Of Visiting Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 17, 2021: [Waiver Of Indictment]
  • May 17, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 14, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order]
  • May 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 07, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 04, 2021: [Continue]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 27, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 26, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 26, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • April 26, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.