U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Naylor-Legg et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Transcript]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • January 04, 2023: [Response To Motion]
  • January 03, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order]
  • January 03, 2023: [Reply To Response]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Response In Opposition]
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 24, 2022: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal Highly Sensitive Document]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response To Motion]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Hearing]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arraignment Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • November 01, 2022: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 04, 2022: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • October 04, 2022: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 09, 2022: [Leave To File Document]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • August 03, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 24, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal Highly Sensitive Document]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 15, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 13, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Return Of Service On Subpoena]
  • July 12, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • June 29, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • June 29, 2022: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • June 29, 2022: [Response In Opposition]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order]
  • June 28, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 28, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 28, 2022: [Voir Dire - Proposed by Counsel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Trial Brief]
  • June 28, 2022: [Jury Instructions - Proposed By Counsel]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • June 27, 2022: [Juror Questionnaires]
  • June 24, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 21, 2022: [COVID-19 Juror Questionnaire (Blank)]
  • June 17, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • June 16, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Reconsideration]
  • June 09, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition in Limine]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sealed Motion (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 21, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sealed Document - (SEALED - Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Seal Highly Sensitive Document]
  • April 04, 2022: [Motion To Seal - Highly Sensitive Document - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • March 29, 2022: [Transcript]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 17, 2022: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • March 16, 2022: [In Limine]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • March 02, 2022: [Transcript]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • February 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 27, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Protective Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 26, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
  • December 06, 2021: [Letter To Clerk Requesting Issuance Of Subpoenas]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Disclosure]
  • November 23, 2021: [Disclosure]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines And Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • November 15, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice Of Certification For Use Of Courtroom Technology]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • October 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 12, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order]
  • October 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 01, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • October 01, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • September 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 07, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2021: [Order]
  • August 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 30, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • August 27, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • August 12, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • August 12, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order]
  • August 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 09, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Protective Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • July 30, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • July 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order]
  • July 02, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 02, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Protective Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Hearing]
  • May 18, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sealed Document - (SEALED - Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2021: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 14, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • May 04, 2021: [Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 28, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Add And Terminate Attorneys]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • April 27, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.