U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ray
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 21, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • October 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • October 26, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • October 25, 2022: [Sealed Document - (SEALED - Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Hearing]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 29, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 29, 2022: [Letter]
  • August 25, 2022: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • August 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 18, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [Hearing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 06, 2022: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Hearing]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 18, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2022: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • April 06, 2022: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Response To Court Order]
  • September 29, 2021: [Response To Court Order]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 28, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 27, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 22, 2021: [Response To Motion]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Directing Government To Respond To A Motion]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 15, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 18, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Hearing]
  • May 11, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 07, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 05, 2021: [Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Witness List]
  • May 04, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Waiver Of Right]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • April 27, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Motion]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.