U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • November 23, 2021: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order]
  • July 22, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 20, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 19, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • July 19, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order On Ex Parte Sealed Motion]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • April 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.