U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Bills
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2022: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • May 23, 2022: [Witness List]
  • May 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2022: [Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 16, 2022: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order]
  • April 26, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 25, 2022: [Competency Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Unseal Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Unseal Document]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • February 03, 2022: [Response To Court Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 27, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Status Conference]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 23, 2021: [Response To Court Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Response To Court Order]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Sealed Materials Pursuant To Court Order - RESTRICTED - (No Document Access)]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 13, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 21, 2021: [Psychiatric Exam]
  • July 21, 2021: [Discovery]
  • July 21, 2021: [Appoint Expert]
  • July 21, 2021: [Dismiss]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.