U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00061-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Ferrusquia-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Supervision]
  • February 09, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • February 08, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 07, 2022: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • February 07, 2022: [Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • December 14, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • December 14, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • December 14, 2021: [Witness List]
  • December 14, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Suppress]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Motion]
  • November 03, 2021: [Response In Support]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension Of Time To File Response/Reply]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 14, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • October 14, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • October 14, 2021: [Witness List]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Response In Opposition]
  • October 01, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Suppress]
August, 2021
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 11, 2021: [Continue]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2021: [Extension Of Time To File Document]
June, 2021
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 11, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • April 27, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.