U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Gonzalez-Quevedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Judgment Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 10, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 10, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 10, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 10, 2021: [Judgment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Plea And Sentence]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 21, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order]
  • May 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 14, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 06, 2021: [Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Oath of Court Interpreter]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standing Order of Reference for Judge Berger]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.