U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice Of Transfer To Another Jurisdiction]
  • November 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • October 14, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • October 14, 2021: [Judgment]
  • October 12, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 04, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • July 06, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • July 06, 2021: [Witness List]
  • July 06, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines And Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • May 20, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 11, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 04, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 04, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.