U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Lewis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Criminal Debt Payment via IPAC]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 07, 2021: [Letter]
  • December 06, 2021: [Letter]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • September 08, 2021: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • September 08, 2021: [Judgment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Sentencing]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Sentencing Memorandum]
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • June 08, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • June 08, 2021: [Witness List]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • May 26, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 12, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 06, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 06, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.