U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Sample
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Statement Of Reasons - SEALED (Public Docket Entry; NEF; No Document Access)]
  • June 30, 2022: [Transmitted Certified Copy]
  • June 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice Of Docket Correction]
  • June 28, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 02, 2021: [Witness List]
  • November 02, 2021: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • November 02, 2021: [Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 24, 2021: [Withdraw As Attorney]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • July 27, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • May 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • May 19, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 05, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 05, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order]
  • April 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.