U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Southern District of West Virginia

west virginia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Southern District of West Virginia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Scott
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Motion To Seal - General - SEALED (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice Of Change Of Attorney Information]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Report]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order Allowing Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 07, 2022: [Written Plea Of Guilty]
  • February 07, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 07, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order On Motion / Application / Petition To Schedule Plea Hearing]
  • January 27, 2022: [Schedule Guilty Plea Hearing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • December 02, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 07, 2021: [Supplemental Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines And Hearings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Indictment - Superseding - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • June 14, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 01, 2021: [Response To Standard Discovery Requests and Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 19, 2021: [Waiver Of Right]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arraignment Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • May 19, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 19, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report - SEALED DOC - (Public Docket Entry ; NEF ; No Document Access)]
  • May 17, 2021: [Notice Of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order]
  • May 14, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 14, 2021: [Warrant For Defendant Returned Executed]
  • May 14, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order for Warrant]
  • April 28, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - UNREDACTED Copy for Court Users Only]
  • April 28, 2021: [Indictment - REDACTED Copy for Public Users]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.